THE WALKER BARSTOW HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of Almshouse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 14 February 1974: Standard registration
- CAMERON WALKER COURT (Working name)
- THE CAMERON WALKER COURT TRUST (Working name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS BIRCH | Chair |
|
||||||
Stephanie Lynn | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Lacy | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Arden | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.34k | £87.53k | £84.65k | £85.85k | £97.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.19k | £76.45k | £73.38k | £76.10k | £73.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 January 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 January 2021 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14/02/1974 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/09/1980 AS AMENDED ON 15/12/2015
Charitable objects
1) FOR REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT OR REBUILDING OF THE ALMSHOUSES. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN A RADIUS OF TEN MILES FROM YORK GENERAL POST OFFICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mulberry PM
11 Walmgate
York
YO1 9TX
- Phone:
- 01904 655200
- Email:
- info@mulberrypm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window