Financial history ROBINSON'S RETREAT AND RELIEF CHARITIES

Charity number: 222700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £74.48k £94.91k £100.37k £104.32k £110.65k
Total expenditure £102.11k £98.79k £118.27k £126.94k £121.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A