THE TRIANGLE TRUST 1949 FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to not-for-profit organisations working with carers or the rehabilitation of offenders
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£726,485
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £726.49k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,165,907
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,743,619 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.17m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.17m | |
Retained for future use | £1.30m |
People

2 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Elizabeth Hope | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rhia Canady | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Cheong Hang Tao | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Rebecca Smith | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hindpal Singh Bhui | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clio Carpenter | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
James MARSHALL | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||
David Loudon | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Foster | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN DRURY | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £737.36k | £740.68k | £700.68k | £701.80k | £726.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £623.40k | £865.46k | £649.98k | £949.07k | £1.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £737.36k | £740.68k | £700.68k | £701.80k | £726.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £623.40k | £865.46k | £649.98k | £949.07k | £1.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.99k | £4.51k | £11.72k | £7.18k | £9.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £792.75k | £556.01k | £841.34k | £1.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.82m | £2.02k | £3.53k | £3.20k | £2.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £22.89m | £23.39m | £21.98m | £23.57m | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £840.19k | £969.18k | £730.06k | £465.49k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £109.15k | £74.20k | £153.83k | £158.72k | £181.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 DECEMBER 1949 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 DECEMBER 1999 AND BY TRUSTEES RESOLUTION ADOPTED ON 11 JUNE 2004. AS AMENDED ON 18/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRIANGLE TRUST 1949 FUND SHALL SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT THEREOUT OF ALL COSTS AND EXPENSES INCURRED IN OR ABOUT THE FORMATION ADMINISTRATION AND EXECUTION OF THE TRUSTS THEREOF BE APPLIED TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) IN ASSISTING (AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES) BY THE PROVISION OF ALLOWANCES FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATION PERSONS EMPLOYED OR FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY IN ENGLAND OR WALES OR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (B) IN ASSISTING (AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES) IN ANY CASES OF POVERTY ARISING FROM SICKNESS ILL-HEALTH WAR DAMAGE NATIONAL SERVICE OR OTHER CAUSE WHATSOEVER PERSONS EMPLOYED OR FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY IN ENGLAND AND WALES OR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS INCLUDING EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES AND THE DEPENDANTS OF EMPLOYEES OR FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE FIRM OR OF ANY OTHER SUCH COMPANY WITH WHICH THE FIRM MAY BE AMALGAMATED OR INTO WHICH IT MAY BE RECONSTRUCTED OR OF ANY SUBSIDIARY COMPANY OF THE FIRM OR OF ANY OTHER COMPANY WITH WHICH THE FIRM MAY BE AMALGAMATED OR INTO WHICH IT MAY BE RECONSTRUCTED BUT EXCLUDING THE SETTLOR AND HIS WIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brighton Eco Centre
39-41 Surrey Street
Brighton
East Sussex
BN1 3PB
- Phone:
- 07716378564
- Email:
- info@triangletrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window