Financial history BLANCHE A BROOKS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 223296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.46k £926 £1.26k £896 £1.08k
Total expenditure £0 £1.34k £1.41k £600 £765
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A