Financial history WILLIAM LARMOUR ENGLISH CHARITY

Charity number: 223690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.61k £1.72k £1.86k £2.15k £1.97k
Total expenditure £600 £0 £800 £0 £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A