THE CRUSADERS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of Crusaders shall be to teach young people about our Lord Jesus Christ as presented in the Bible with a view to developing a personal faith in Christ and an effective Christian life of service. Charity became incorporated (ref: 1144923) on 1st January 2012 and so the 'old' charity is dormant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1963: Standard registration
- 31 October 1996: Removed
- CRUSADERS (Working name)
- URBAN SAINTS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Michael James | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Victor Instone | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Janet Dawson | Trustee | 04 July 2020 |
|
|||||
David Fowler | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Matthew Judson | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rachel Retallick-Cheel | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Marchant | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED ON THE 3 JUNE 2000, 7 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 6 OCTOBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CRUSADERS UNION SHALL BE TO TEACH YOUNG PEOPLE ABOUT OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AS PRESENTED IN THE BIBLE WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING A PERSONAL FAITH IN CHRIST AND AN EFFECTIVE CHRISTIAN LIFE OF SERVICE. THE OBJECTS SHALL BE CARRIED OUT IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. SHARING THE GOOD NEWS OF JESUS CHRIST. 2. SPIRITUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF LEADERS, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH INVOLVEMENT IN RELATIONAL YOUTH WORK. 3. PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR TRAINING, RESIDENTIAL EXPERIENCES AND OTHER EVENTS TO ENABLE SUCH DEVELOPMENT. II. SPIRITUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF LEADERS, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH INVOLVEMENT IN RELATIONAL YOUTH WORK. III. PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR TRAINING, RESIDENTIAL EXPERIENCES AND OTHER EVENTS TO ENABLE SUCH DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1963 : Standard registration
- 31 October 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Urban Saints
Westbrook Centre
Oakhill Road
RYDE
Isle Of Wight
PO33 1PU
- Phone:
- 01582589850
- Email:
- email@urbansaints.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window