THE STEWARDSHIP TRUST RIPON

Charity number: 224447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion in the UK and worldwide and humanitarian work and relief (homelessness, disability, famine relief, education and training, and advancement of health) primarily in overseas countries .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £24,997
Total expenditure: £20,221

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Niger
  • Ukraine

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR D W METCALFE Chair 04 August 2011
None on record
STEPHEN MARK FAY Trustee 14 July 2021
THE GOSPEL IN ACTION TRUST
Received: On time
Naomi Mawhinney Trustee 17 April 2019
SAHARA DESERT MISSION
Received: On time
S PHILIP METCALFE Trustee 09 August 2011
None on record
MRS R FAY Trustee 07 December 1990
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.98k £24.91k £24.91k £24.90k £25.00k
Total expenditure £23.16k £22.99k £28.77k £17.39k £20.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HUTTON HILL
HUTTON BANK
RIPON
HG4 5DT
Phone:
01765602887
Website:

No information available