Financial history THE HUDDERSFIELD DRILL HALL AND TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 224671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.91k £21.52k £28.56k £28.95k £29.04k
Total expenditure £14.59k £17.70k £21.75k £22.92k £22.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A