Financial history WILLISTON'S GIFT

Charity number: 225239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.52k £11.89k £11.93k £12.30k £12.34k
Total expenditure £9.51k £2.84k £6.48k £11.09k £21.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A