THE CONSTABLES'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE WENTWORTH PARISH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rotherham
Governance
- 11 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Walter Hill | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Neville Martin | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Roger Knight | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Michael Peace | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Shaw | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Valarie Sykes | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Brendan McNamara | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21 | £22 | £22 | £23 | £21 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £22 | £22 | £23 | £21 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 15 AUGUST 1905
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WENTWORTH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WENTWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 515
BARNSLEY
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S73 3AB
- Phone:
- 07790926707
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window