Financial history GARSTANG TOWN TRUST

Charity Number: 225449
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.61k £48.77k £56.72k £56.72k £61.47k
Total expenditure £59.17k £41.70k £54.24k £54.24k £65.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A