THE CANCER RESEARCH CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ATTACK AND DEFEAT THE DISEASE OF CANCER IN ALL FORMS TO INVESTIGATE ITS CAUSES, DISTRIBUTION, SYMPTOMS, PATHOLOGY, TREATMENT AND TO PROMOTE ITS CURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 April 1963: Standard registration
- BRITISH EMPIRE CANCER CAMPAIGN FOR RESEARCH (Previous name)
- CANCER RESEARCH CAMPAIGN (Previous name)
- THE CANCER RESEARCH CAMPAIGN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JULIAN HOWARD ALMOND | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|||||
CANCER RESEARCH UK | Trustee | 27 August 2002 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS OF 3/7/1952, 8/11/1954, 5/7/1962, 19/7/1963, 4/5/1970, 10/5/1971, 6/7/1977, 4/7/1979, 8/12/1980, 14/7/1983, 4/7/1985, 4/7/1990, 28/5/1992, 22/7/1993, 26/11/96, 17/9/98, 24/11/99, 27/11/00, 27/8/02
Charitable objects
TO ATTACK AND DEFEAT THE DISEASE OF CANCER IN ALL FORMS TO INVESTIGATE ITS CAUSES, DISTRIBUTION, SYMPTOMS, PATHOLOGY, TREATMENT AND TO PROMOTE ITS CURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 24 April 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 REDMAN PLACE
LONDON
E20 1JQ
- Phone:
- 02072420200
- Email:
- secretariat@cancer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window