JOHN AND ELIZA JELLEY HOMES FOR OLD PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the provision of almshouses for old people who are incapable by age or infirmity of earning their living and who have led respectable virtuous sober and upright lives. So far as practicable preference shall be given to those who are natives of or have lived many years in or near the City of Nottingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 17 October 1963: Standard registration
- JOHN AND ELIZA JELLY HOMES FOR OLD PEOPLE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES NIGEL Cullen | Chair | 13 March 2011 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN POWELL | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Jacqueline Olpin | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
JULIAN HEALEY | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JACQUELINE FRANCES FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
GORDON FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.69k | £112.60k | £121.18k | £134.14k | £128.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.73k | £88.79k | £97.50k | £98.56k | £160.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT NOTTINGHAM 29 MAY 1914 AND SCHEME OF THE 12 DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR OLD PEOPLE WHO ARE INCAPBLE BY AGE OR INFIRMITY OR EARNING THEIR OWN LIVING AND WHO HAVE LED RESPECTABLE VIRTUOUS SOBER AND UPRIGHT LIVES AND SO FAR AS PRACTICABLE PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO THOSE WHO ARE NATIVES OR HAVE LIVED MANY YEARS IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM. PAYMENT OF YEARLY SUM NOT LESS THAN $520 TO GHE ACCOUNT OF THE EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR FUND.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anna Chandler
PO Box 11228
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6YY
- Phone:
- 07354875035
- Email:
- anna@chandler-cc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window