FRIENDS OF THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers residential, nursing and dementia care to older people in care homes on nine sites across England. We operate day care centres and a free-to-access grants service for individuals, and work to combat the devastating effects of loneliness among older people. Our vision is for a society in which all older people have the opportunity to live fulfilled lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£22,762,000
Donations and legacies | £752.00k | |
Charitable activities | £20.74m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £639.00k | |
Other | £631.00k |
Total expenditure:
£23,953,000
Raising funds | £449.00k | |
Charitable activities | £23.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,033,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,884,432 from 37 government contract(s) and £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £449.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £23.50m |
People

491 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 November 1964: Standard registration
- 06 June 2006: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Maidment | Chair | 22 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Nicholas William James Avery | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Lee Houghton | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Jeffrey Duncan | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jane Louise Makinson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Anne Rees | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Deacon | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Guy Foster | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Richard Beecroft | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Clare Hogarty | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emerell Sonia Campbell | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Sharon Prosser | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.16m | £20.34m | £19.65m | £21.84m | £22.76m | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.31m | £22.22m | £21.11m | £22.63m | £23.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.87m | £2.24m | £2.65m | £2.42m | £2.88m | |
|
Income from government grants | £166.00k | £1.49m | £796.00k | £13.95k | £8.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £696.00k | £2.08m | £1.48m | £2.03m | £752.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £20.99m | £17.72m | £17.11m | £19.17m | £20.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £537.00k | £548.00k | £649.00k | £638.00k | £639.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £939.00k | £0 | £404.00k | £7.00k | £631.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £104.00k | £144.00k | £99.00k | £235.00k | £226.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.99m | £21.90m | £20.76m | £22.29m | £23.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £313.00k | £319.00k | £349.00k | £347.00k | £449.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £221.00k | £182.00k | £328.00k | £336.00k | £482.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £103.00k | £111.00k | £103.00k | £81.00k | £115.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.46m | £22.27m | £21.75m | £21.97m | £21.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £16.93m | £19.39m | £19.91m | £16.70m | £16.31m | |
|
Other assets | £4.62m | £3.48m | £3.38m | £4.45m | £5.32m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£125.00k | -£112.00k | -£37.00k | -£24.00k | -£9.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.17m | £5.04m | £4.93m | £4.71m | £5.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/02/1914 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/1955 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH, ACQUIRE OR TAKE OVER, CONDUCT AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE RESIDENTIAL AND NURSING HOMES, AND IN PARTICULAR RESIDENTIAL AND NURSING HOMES FOR THE POOR, NEEDY OR ELDERLY, CONVALESCENT HOMES FOR THE SICK OR INFIRM AND HOLIDAY OR OTHER HOMES FOR PERSONS OF ANY AGE AND EITHER SEX WHO FOR FINANCIAL REASONS OR OTHERWISE ARE IN NEED OF THE CARE AND ASSISTANCE PROVIDED IN SUCH HOMES, WITH POWER, BUT WITHOUT ANY OBLIGATION, TO CHARGE FEES OF SUCH AMOUNT AS THE SOCIETY SHALL IN ANY INDIVIDUAL CASE CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN RESPECT OF THE ACCOMMODATION IN SUCH HOMES OF ANY PERSON ACCOMMODATED THERE WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE SOCIETY, CAN REASONABLY BE REQUIRED TO PAY SUCH FEES FOR SUCH ACCOMMODATION. TO RELIEVE POVERTY SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG THE ELDERLY, THE SICK, THE DISABLED OR OTHER GENUINELY NEEDY PERSONS REGARDLESS OF AGE OR SEX IN WHATEVER MANNER THE COMMITTEE OR GOVERNING BODY OF THE SOCIETY MAY DEEM APPROPRIATE. TO GIVE ASSISTANCE IN MONEY OR IN KIND TO THOSE WHO ARE GENUINELY NEEDY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ALICE LOUISA GRIGGS WIDOWS' FUND
- CHARITY OF JAMES MEW FOR POOR AND AFFLICTED MEN AND WOMEN
- CHICK AND HARMSWORTH CHARITY
- COLLIN AND DAVIS CHARITY
- DR MACNAUGHTON PENSION FUND
- ELIZABETH ANN WALKER
- ETHEL DE METZ SPYER ASSISTANCE FUND FOR GENTLEWOMEN
- FREDERICK BYNG PENSION FUND
- HARRY LIVESEY CHARITY
- JANET LACEY PENSION FUND
- LUCY GRUNDY KELLETT
- ST GEORGE'S HOUSE FUND
- THE HOUSE OF NUNN
- THE PENSION CHARITY OF WILLIAM LAMBE
- THE RETIRED NURSES NATIONAL HOME 1937
- THE SIR THOMAS LIPTON CHARITY
- THE SMILES HOME
- WILLIAM EDMONDS FUND
- 26 November 1964 : Standard registration
- 06 June 2006 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bradbury Centre
Smiles Place
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 8BJ
- Phone:
- 02077308263
- Email:
- enquiries@fote.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window