Financial history THE ROBERT HILL AND NOBLE STREET CHARITY

Charity number: 226135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.41k £3.58k £3.35k £3.24k £3.65k
Total expenditure £1.55k £2.00k £1.90k £1.84k £1.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A