DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND

Charity number: 226297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To use money raised to provide holidays for disadvantaged, low income Sheffield families referred by a welfare agent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £851
Total expenditure: £851

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HELEN WILSON SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Meadows Chair 01 November 2014
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
Clare Rachel Hopkins Trustee 08 April 2024
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
Michael Kevin James Lofthouse Trustee 08 April 2024
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
Ellie May Ford Trustee 06 September 2023
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
James Parker Trustee 22 November 2021
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
Alison Gardner Trustee 01 October 2018
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
SARA MARGARET GOWEN Trustee 16 February 2017
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD PALESTINE WOMEN'S SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
STEPHEN ALLEN Trustee 01 November 2014
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
JUNE BLOWER Trustee 19 June 2013
None on record
JIM FULTON Trustee 28 October 2011
ASPIRE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE (SHEFFIELD) LIMITED
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
SIR GEORGE FRANKLIN'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
THE QUEEN VICTORIA AND JOHNSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: 12 days late
H M BURDALL CHARITY
Received: On time
LIZ MURRAY Trustee
THE SIR HENRY STEPHENSON ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
CHERRYTREE
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
JOHN FROGGATT BARRY HOPKINS Trustee
SIR GEORGE FRANKLIN'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
THE QUEEN VICTORIA AND JOHNSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: 12 days late
H M BURDALL CHARITY
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £800 £800 £800 £840 £851
Total expenditure £800 £800 £800 £840 £851
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 Charnock Wood Road
SHEFFIELD
S12 3HL
Phone:
07855908266
Website:

No information available