THE SEVENOAKS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 226418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sevenoaks Almshouse Charity offers accomodation to people who meet the guidelines for selection of residents. The area of benefit is the area administered by Sevenoaks District Council

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £221,931
Total expenditure: £421,140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR M BOLTON Chair
None on record
Alan John Pople Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Roger Best Trustee 20 January 2020
SEVENOAKS SCHOOL
Received: On time
Dr Jean Merilyn Canet Trustee 11 December 2019
STAG COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE
Received: On time
LADY MARGARET BOSWELL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Christine Brindley Trustee 13 September 2018
MEDAIR UK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, SEVENOAKS
Received: On time
Peter Stewart Trustee 13 September 2018
None on record
Felicity Broomby Trustee 14 October 2013
None on record
JAMES LONDON Trustee 30 July 2012
None on record
Helen Tebay Trustee 30 August 1969
None on record
REV A MACLEAY Trustee
CHARITY OF SIR HENRY FERMOR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £212.21k £207.90k £209.55k £224.67k £221.93k
Total expenditure £90.34k £203.63k £211.21k £100.02k £421.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SEVENOAKS SCHOOL
HIGH STREET
SEVENOAKS
TN13 1HU
Phone:
01732455133