Financial history Great Bowden Village Hall

Charity number: 226590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.37k £5.11k £17.86k £13.18k £16.35k
Total expenditure £15.34k £4.88k £9.69k £13.60k £20.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.67k N/A N/A