FRIENDLY SOCIETIES' CONVALESCENT SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of sickness and the preservation of health of the public by providing grants to help in the provision of facilities and support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 1963: Standard registration
- FRIENDLY SOCIETIES' CONVALESCENT HOME (Previous name)
- FRIENDLY SOCIETIES' CONVALESCENT HOMES CHARITY, DOVER, HERNE BAY AND ELSEWHERE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET MARGARET CLEMENTS DOE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gail Lancaster | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Andrew | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lewis | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Anne Deacon | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Potten | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Stanley | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.45k | £42.27k | £40.22k | £49.47k | £49.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.73k | £54.50k | £64.16k | £54.97k | £53.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ASSIST MEMBERS OF FRIENDLY SOCIETIES BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO HELP IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Gladstone Road
Willesborough
Ashford
TN24 0DE
- Phone:
- 07947645558
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window