ROYAL BOTANICAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY OF MANCHESTER AND THE NORTHERN COUNTIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making charity. Grants are made to organisations applying in the botanical and horticultural sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 1964: Standard registration
- 26 August 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 August 2015: Funds transferred to 702017 THE NORTH OF ENGLAND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY
- ROYAL BOTANICAL SOCIETY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.79k | £20.39k | £51.34k | £25.19k | £24.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.17k | £22.66k | £37.51k | £59.90k | £25.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 14 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 17 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 06 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 06 September 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE SOCIETY AS AMENDED 30 OCTOBER 1935, 30 MARCH 1994, 15 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 13 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SCIENCE AND ART IN BOTANY AND HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window