Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE FAIRACRES CONVENT FABRIC REPAIR FUND
Charity number: 261722-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1966 AND SCHEME OF 6 NOVEMBER 1973 (NOTE: CEASED TO EXIST IN 1996 - SHOULD HAVE BEEN REMOVED FROM THE CENTRAL REGISTER OF CHARITIES ON 20 NOVEMBER 1996)
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE INCOME FOR IMPROVEMENTS OF BUILDINGS, DEMOLITION AND REPLACEMENT OF OBSOLETE BUILDINGS, ENLARGEMENT OF BUILDINGS AND ESSENTIAL REPAIRS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 29 October 1970: Standard registration
- 25 May 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.