Trustees WESTMINSTER ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION
Charity number: 226936
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Ford | Chair | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Clare Gilhooly | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
LADY RACHAEL ROBATHAN | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Suzanne Ruth Outram Procter | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Councillor Jim Glen | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Xavier Nicholas Chwoles Villers | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Councillor Selina Short | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Lucy Alexandra Slater | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev GRAHAM MARTIN BUCKLE | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Charles Lillis | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
LADY JOANNA KNATCHBULL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.