ARTHUR ROBINSON WILL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds donated to Catholic Childrens Society Westminster arch diocese branch. Care and advice to children and families. Full report of their work available from society 73 St Charles Square, London W10 - in early days of trust given to childrens home organised by a community of nuns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 1964: Standard registration
- 14 September 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 September 2016: Funds transferred to 233699 WESTMINSTER ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST AND OTHE...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.11k | £4.11k | £4.17k | £3.66k | £3.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £0 | £13.19k | £2.78k | £2.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 05 March 2015 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 08 October 2014 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 25TH AUGUST 1893
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF AN ORPHANAGE AT BRUGES FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC BOYS, OR FOR OTHER ROMAN CATHOLIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES IN ENGLAND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window