Financial history THE ELIZABETH CASSON TRUST

Charity Number: 227166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £213.85k £260.33k £266.97k £277.55k £299.18k
Total expenditure £440.73k £303.27k £362.79k £475.35k £334.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A