THE DOROTHY WATKINS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 227784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants for advancement of religion and education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £3,603
Total expenditure: £13,048

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLYN MARGARET WATKINS Trustee 02 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS BLACKHEATH PARK SE3
Received: 3 days late
Richard Watkins Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.76k £2.24k £30.37k £15.44k £3.60k
Total expenditure £5.33k £8.96k £3.50k £4.02k £13.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 01 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 July 2023 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 14 July 2023 159 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 June 2023 499 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 June 2023 864 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 William Street
Mumbles
SWANSEA
SA3 4LJ
Phone:
01792809525
Website:

No information available