THE ELSIE S BARNEY MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Linked to main almshouse charity, Hull Charterhouse. Fund is used to purchase flowers to decorate the chapel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 01 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Sharon Kassim | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Councillor Travey Henry | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Julia Connor | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Tracy Neal | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Shepherd | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Mann | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev JAMES HARGREAVE | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ELLEN WHITTAKER | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN L FAREHAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180 | £175 | £70 | £147 | £94 | |
|
Total expenditure | £47 | £42 | £78 | £52 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH APRIL 1963.
Charitable objects
`PROVISION OF FLOWERS FOR THE ALTAR OF THE CHAPEL OF THE CHARTERHOUSE IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON-UPON-HULL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAWLEY JUDGE & EASTON
1 PARLIAMENT STREET
HULL
HU1 2AS
- Phone:
- 01482224763
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window