THE GRANTHAM YORKE TRUST

Charity number: 228466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education, physical, social training, rehabilitation, recreational pursuits to those under 25 and in need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £270,003
Total expenditure: £276,014

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 20 October 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr T Clarke Chair
None on record
Emma Germaine Payne Trustee 16 September 2024
MARTINEAU GARDENS
Received: On time
Simon John Evans Trustee 04 March 2024
The Samuel Manninge Charity
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Matthew Thompson Trustee 02 September 2019
THE BLUE COAT SCHOOL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ST PHILIP'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF BIRMINGHAM CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
ST BASIL'S
Received: On time
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST PHILIP BIRMINGHAM
Recently registered
Beverley Momenabadi Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
HUGH SHERRIFFE Trustee 15 October 2015
THE POLICE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mrs S Butler Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record
Howard Belton Trustee
RICHARDSON BROTHERS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mr F Rattley Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £298.53k £218.58k £242.65k £261.90k £270.00k
Total expenditure £359.37k £333.45k £317.74k £352.76k £276.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 18 March 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 18 March 2024 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
UNKNOWN
Charitable objects
USED BY THE GOVERNORS TO AUGMENT THE OBJECTS OF THE SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF SERVICES USUALLY OF A WELFARE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 November 1963 : Standard registration
  • 20 October 1993 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Registered Office - Shakespeare Martineau
1 Colmore Square
BIRMINGHAM
Email for Correspondence Address
B4 6AA
Phone:
07940 160 844
Website:

No information available