Trustees ST. NICHOLAS' EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 228547

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY MITCHELL REID | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Peacock | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAELA DAWN MARTIN | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Herr Thomas Braun | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE TATE | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WAUGH MBE | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||
ROBERT LEE JOBLING | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.