THE JOHN THOMAS MATTHEWS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns almshouses to provide accommodation for people in need at or near retiring age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 03 October 1963: Standard registration
- ST IVES MATTHEW'S TRUST (Working name)
- JOHN THOMAS MATTHEW'S CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW CARE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachel Stratton Berg Hollow | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Curnow | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Mr Tony Hollow | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR KEN BASSETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP WILLIAM THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS DEE LAWRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.53k | £16.66k | £17.70k | £17.60k | £22.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.98k | £23.15k | £20.24k | £13.43k | £79.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22ND JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
THE INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED TO MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY AND ANY OTHER COSTS INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ST IVES AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cedar Lodge
Wheal Whidden
Carbis Bay
ST. IVES
TR26 2QX
- Phone:
- 01736796863
- Email:
- jtm.trust@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window