THE SAMUEL FRANKLIN FUND ELSWORTH

Charity number: 228775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Samuel Franklin Fund (Elsworth) benefits the residents of the parish of Elsworth who are in need through financial hardship, illness, disability or infirmity. It can also assist those preparing for, or entering any trade, occupation or profession. Grants can be made to individuals or to societies/organisations/institutions that assist those in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £29,071
Total expenditure: £39,547

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SAMUEL FRANKLIN'S ALMSHOUSE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS ANNIE HOWELL Chair
None on record
Rev NIGEL DI CASTIGLIONE Trustee 10 August 2015
THE TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
David Jonathan Pope Trustee 10 July 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.45k £22.82k £33.41k £34.14k £29.07k
Total expenditure £28.75k £27.25k £26.94k £35.43k £39.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 May 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 May 2024 184 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 Constellation Mobile Home Park
Elsworth
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 4JP
Phone:
07400378911
Website:

No information available