BLISS GATE VILLAGE FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bliss Gate Village Field is a 5 acre site located next to the village of Bliss Gate. There is a play area suitable for young children and an area of orchard / woodland as well as open space for walking etc. The field is open to all local residents in the area and can be used for a variety of activities including "fun days", car boot sales and informal games of football and cricket.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 March 1964: Standard registration
- BLISS GATE FIELDS (Working name)
- BLISS GATE FIELDS MANAGEMENT COMMITEE (Working name)
- BLISS GATE PLAYING FIELDS (Previous name)
- GORST HILL VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE SKIDMORE | Chair | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
John Watson | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lucia Harvey | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ZOE SKIDMORE | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Isobel May HARDING | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sara Jayne Watson | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jayne Tramontana | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67k | £759 | £739 | £739 | £2.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £417 | £433 | £1.00k | £1.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PLAYING FIELDS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GORST HILL AND OF THE REMAINING AREA WITHIN A RADIUS OF FOUR MILES OF THE FORMER PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL AT BLISS GATE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Orchard Close
Rock
KIDDERMINSTER
DY14 9XZ
- Phone:
- 01299 266951
- Email:
- sarajayne1983w@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window