THE ORDER OF ST BENEDICT AT ALTON ABBEY

Charity number: 229216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enable the Community to live a monastic life according to the rule of St Benedict and provide a retreat guesthouse

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £58,350
Total expenditure: £150,723

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE ORDER OF ST BENEDICT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Nigel Price Chair
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
ALTON ABBEY CIO
Recently registered
THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Timothy Patrick Abraham Trustee 07 April 2022
THE ST LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, CLAPHAM
Recently registered
KESTON COLLEGE
Received: On time
ALTON ABBEY CIO
Recently registered
THE ST JOHN THE DIVINE KENNINGTON PASTORAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Rev Jonathan Edward Evans Trustee 07 April 2022
Friends of Saint Mary's Bruton
Received: On time
ALTON ABBEY CIO
Recently registered
SEXEY'S SCHOOL, BRUTON
Received: On time
The Reverend Canon Timothy David Pike Trustee 07 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS WITH ST. JAMES - CROYDON
Received: On time
DOM Anthony Witherspoon Trustee 22 February 2018
None on record
DOM Timothy Bavin OSB Trustee 25 April 2014
None on record
DOM Anselm Shobrook OSB Trustee 25 April 2014
None on record
DOM ANDREW EDMOND ST GILES JOHNSON OSB Trustee
None on record
THE RT REVD DOM GILES HILL OSB Trustee
ALTON ABBEY CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £149.93k £121.97k £175.69k £106.13k £58.35k
Total expenditure £152.16k £132.68k £187.83k £156.75k £150.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.58k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Estuary Avenue
Appledore
Bideford
Devon
EX39 1GF
Phone:
01420561691