HENRY JOHN STRONG PENSIONS

Charity number: 229379
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of pensions to men and women of poor standing in the Church of England over the age of 65 who have resided in the Croydon area for not less than 10 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015

Total income: £1,764
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1963: Standard registration
  • 10 February 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 10 February 2017: Funds transferred to 312612 THE WHITGIFT FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £1.69k £1.70k £1.99k £1.78k £1.76k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 17 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 21 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2013 20 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required