Financial history HODGKIN HOUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 229485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £300.40k £310.00k £357.88k £394.89k £420.33k
Total expenditure £329.86k £319.00k £394.95k £361.67k £322.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.53k N/A N/A N/A N/A