Financial history SidLife Limited

Charity number: 229545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.04m £937.97k £1.01m £819.02k £1.51m
Total expenditure £1.07m £872.39k £1.35m £904.32k £802.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £68.10k £3.50k £1.10k £1.03k £2.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £951.75k £918.32k £999.61k £805.56k £912.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.36k £16.16k £11.50k £12.43k £14.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £583.48k
Income - Legacies £62.17k £2.86k £0 £0 £1.30k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £984.89k £872.39k £1.35m £904.32k £798.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £83.42k £0 £0 £0 £4.19k
Expenditure - Governance £21.40k £7.96k £14.07k £18.83k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £60.47k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0