Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTES - ISLE OF ELY FEDERATION

Charity number: 229628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Shortland Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Marion Hodges Trustee 01 April 2020
THE ISLE OF ELY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Received: 17 days late
MARSHLAND ST JAMES WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Elizabeth Jordan Trustee 01 April 2020
TYDD ST GILES COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Jane Crossland Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Anne Purt Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Muriel Johns Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Beryl Brook Trustee 06 November 2013
None on record
JUDITH CORNWELL Trustee 01 March 2011
THE ISLE OF ELY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Received: 17 days late
VALERIE ELIZABETH WARE BEM BA Trustee
THE ISLE OF ELY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Received: 17 days late
DENISE WINIFRED HALL Trustee
None on record