SISTERS OF MERCY SUNDERLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community's principal objectives are the furtherance of Roman Catholic and Christian Primary, Secondary & Adult education in the UK and elsewhere. The alleviation of poverty and human suffering and such other activities as Sister Superior shall direct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,286,726
Donations and legacies | £462.12k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £824.61k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,016,034
Raising funds | £88.60k | |
Charitable activities | £1.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£904,854 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £88.60k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.93m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £88.60k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.93m | |
Retained for future use | £175.55k |
People

37 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Northumberland
- Sunderland
Governance
- SISTERS OF MERCY- ST ANTHONY'S CONVENT, ESTABLISHED AT SUNDERLAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Matthews | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrea Maria Shanks | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allison Mary Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SISTER PATRICIA ANNE ADRIENNE SHOULDER | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER STEPHEN | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SISTER RAPHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91m | £1.44m | £1.56m | £1.38m | £1.29m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.39m | £2.24m | £2.38m | £2.66m | £2.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £541.44k | £572.15k | £499.86k | £414.60k | £462.12k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £221.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.14m | £863.91k | £1.06m | £964.03k | £824.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £669 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £8.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.01m | £2.14m | £2.28m | £2.57m | £1.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £382.99k | £93.72k | £106.26k | £95.31k | £88.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.27m | £1.25m | £1.29m | £39.87k | £115.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.19m | £413.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £104.46k | £93.72k | £106.26k | £95.31k | £88.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.76m | £6.16m | £6.15m | £6.13m | £5.36m | |
|
Long-term investments | £29.18m | £28.18m | £30.47m | £24.80m | £25.59m | |
|
Other assets | £2.24m | £1.65m | £1.08m | £1.06m | £537.15k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £94.85k | £183.85k | £112.89k | £139.72k | £130.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATIONAL, RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH IN ENGLAND IN SUCH A WAY AS THE TRUSTEE DSHALL FROM TIME TO TIME (WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SISTER SUPERIOR) DETERMINE. PROVIDED THAT IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER THEY MAY NOT USEFULLY APPLY ASSETS AVAILABLE FOR DISTRIBUTION IN ANY ONE YEAR IN ENGLAND THEN THEY SHALL APPLY THE SAME WITH SUCH CONSENT FOR SUCH WORK ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Linked charities
- SISTERS OF MERCY, RYHOPE DENE CONVENT RYHOPE, CO DURHAM
- SISTERS OF MERCY, ST ANNE'S CONVENT OF MERCY AND HIGH SCHOOL, WOLSINGHAM, CO DURHAM
- SISTERS OF MERCY, ST ANTHONY'S CONVENT
- SISTERS OF MERCY, ST ANTHONY'S CONVENT
- SISTERS OF MERCY-CONVENT OF MERCY, HEXHAM, NORTHUMBERLAND
- SISTERS OF MERCY-CONVENT OF MERCY, SEAHAM, CO DURHAM
- SISTERS OF MERCY-ST ANTHONY'S SECONDARY SCHOOL
- SISTERS OF MERCY-ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT GOSFORTH
- 30 October 1963 : Standard registration
- 08 February 2008 : Removed
- 08 February 2008 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANTHONYS CONVENT OF MERCY
OAKLEA
TUNSTALL ROAD
SUNDERLAND
SR2 7JR
- Phone:
- 01915674653
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window