THE HENRY SMITH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is an endowed grant maker which awards grants for purposes within its objects within the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£14,448,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.45m | |
Other | £2.00k |
Total expenditure:
£65,535,000
Raising funds | £15.76m | |
Charitable activities | £49.77m | |
Other | £0 |
£88,041,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £15.76m | |
Charitable expenditure | £49.77m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £15.76m | |
Charitable expenditure | £49.77m | |
Retained for future use | £36.95m |
People

40 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- SMITHS CHARITY (Working name)
- HENRY SMITH (ESTATES CHARITIES) (Previous name)
- HENRY SMITH (KENSINGTON ESTATES CHARITIES) (Previous name)
- THE CHARITY OF HENRY SMITH (KENSINGTON ESTATE) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Pollock | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
William Sieghart | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Kernighan | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Baldeesh Nahl | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Garrill | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Beeforth | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abureza Faisel Rahman | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Roberts | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Asquith | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Davies | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Granger | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||
The Lady Bella Colgrain DL | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.04m | £12.07m | £11.00m | £11.90m | £14.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.02m | £55.40m | £53.20m | £80.70m | £65.54m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £2.00m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £129.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.91m | £10.04m | £11.00m | £11.89m | £14.45m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £27.00k | £0 | £2.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £33.91m | £41.52m | £42.10m | £68.06m | £49.77m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.11m | £13.88m | £11.10m | £12.64m | £15.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £185.00k | £203.00k | £242.00k | £346.00k | £287.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £30.65m | £38.38m | £38.71m | £63.65m | £44.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.11m | £13.88m | £11.10m | £12.64m | £15.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £123.00k | £139.00k | £129.00k | £126.00k | £42.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.13bn | £1.24bn | £1.42bn | £1.38bn | £1.42bn | |
|
Other assets | £6.88m | £9.06m | £22.80m | £15.27m | £14.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £41.41m | £50.67m | £55.73m | £177.69m | £174.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 05 OCT 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07 MAY 2013 as amended on 06 Dec 2022 as amended on 14 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
SUMMARY OBJECTS ONLY - FOR MORE DETAILS, PLEASE SEE SCHEME 1) RELIEF OF POOR KINDRED OF HENRY SMITH 2) HOSPITALS AND OTHER FORMS OF CARE FOR THOSE WHO ARE SICK OR IN NEED 3) RELIEF OF POOR, AGED OR SICK PERSONS AND THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND DEPENDANTS 4) RELIEF OF POOR, AGED OR SICK CLERGY AND THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND DEPENDANTS 5) RELIEF, REHABILITATION AND TRAINING OF DISABLED PERSONS, INCLUDING DISABLED EX-SERVICEMEN AND WAR WIDOWS 6) MEDICAL RESEARCH 7) PROMOTION OF MORAL WELFARE OR SOCIAL SERVICE 8) RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN SLAVES OR SERFS AND THEIR DESCENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED OR DISTRESS OR FOR PREVENTING THE SEIZURE OF PERSONS FOR SLAVERY OR SERFDOM 9) MAINTENANCE OF GODLY PREACHERS OR OTHERWISE FOR THE FURTHERANCE OR PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND RELIGION 10) RELIEF OF POOR, AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS WITHIN THE ESTATES OR ELSEWHERE IN ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 15 October 1963 : Standard registration
- 15 May 1998 : Removed
- 15 May 1998 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
Caledonia House
223 Pentonville Road
London
- Phone:
- 02072644970
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window