SOCIETY OF JESUS TRUST OF 1929 FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PARISH MINISTRY: in parishes & in university chaplaincies SPIRITUALITY: centres, programmes & publications for spiritual education EDUCATION: schools, colleges of higher education FORMATION: for Jesuits & Catholic clergy SOCIAL JUSTICE & RELIEF OF POVERTY: Jesuit Refugee Service & service to the poor CARE OF INFIRM & ELDERLY JESUITS JESUIT WORK OVERSEAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£27,959,000
Donations and legacies | £5.71m | |
Charitable activities | £9.59m | |
Other trading activities | £329.00k | |
Investments | £11.65m | |
Other | £681.00k |
Total expenditure:
£40,770,000
Raising funds | £3.39m | |
Charitable activities | £37.38m | |
Other | £0 |
£40,449,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.39m | |
Charitable expenditure | £37.38m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.39m | |
Charitable expenditure | £37.38m | |
Retained for future use | £27.64m |
People

389 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Guyana
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 May 1969: Standard registration
- SOCIETY OF JESUS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Gallagher | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Gerard Mitchell SJ | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul Nicholson SJ | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Father Keith Patrick McMillan SJ | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Nicholas Owen Austin SJ | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev MATTHEW POWER SJ | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Arthur Stephen Power SJ | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev David Smolira SJ | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.77m | £29.13m | £21.16m | £27.29m | £27.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.89m | £33.50m | £32.91m | £37.66m | £40.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.64m | £5.78m | £5.58m | £6.71m | £5.71m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £132.00k | £114.00k | £67.00k | £129.00k | £329.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.39m | £8.98m | £9.02m | £9.47m | £9.59m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.23m | £10.25m | £10.00m | £9.87m | £11.65m | |
|
Income - Other | £370.00k | £4.01m | £490.00k | £1.11m | £681.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £546.00k | £1.14m | £743.00k | £561.00k | £848.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £46.14m | £30.74m | £29.67m | £34.33m | £37.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.75m | £2.76m | £3.24m | £3.33m | £3.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £76.63k | £64.66k | £56.20k | £49.82k | £52.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £22.85m | £7.61m | £7.92m | £8.05m | £11.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.78m | £1.91m | £2.36m | £2.46m | £2.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £74.84m | £73.47m | £76.23m | £78.77m | £79.18m | |
|
Long-term investments | £539.23m | £569.28m | £658.32m | £584.54m | £613.74m | |
|
Other assets | £66.53m | £63.76m | £47.16m | £44.16m | £45.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £34.94m | £30.08m | £23.08m | £21.89m | £25.00m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
UV 242 PAGE 331 (TRUST DEED DATED 20 MARCH 1929), ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 5 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 SEPTEMBER 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED OUT BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF OR SUPPORTED BY THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 19 May 1969 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O SECRETARY TO THE TRUSTEES
TRCP
114 MOUNT STREET
LONDON
W1K 3AH
- Phone:
- 02074990285
- Email:
- curia@jesuit.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window