THE EVANS HOMES

Charity number: 230302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing accomodation for women who are in need hardship or distress and such charitable purposes for the benefit of the residents or persons in need or general charitable purposes within the Parishes of Humshaugh and Simonburn as the Trustees decide

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £63,448
Total expenditure: £34,355

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EVANS ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
  • THE EVANS ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS ARTHUR RIDLEY Chair
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF GILES HERON
Received: On time
ST MUNGO'S (SIMONBURN) CHURCH BUILDING TRUST
Received: On time
Rupert Gibson Trustee 17 November 2021
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Sarah Anne Lunn Trustee 17 November 2021
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARLES ANTONY ELLIOTT BRAITHWAITE Trustee
NORTHUMBERLAND NATIONAL PARK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
HARRIET MARY BENSON Trustee
THE CLAYTON COLLECTION OF ROMAN ANTIQUITIES
Received: On time
Dr JOHN PARLANE KINLOCH MCCOLLUM Trustee
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
VERONICA ALLGOOD Trustee
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
ALLGOOD'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £60.00k £60.95k £62.35k £31.43k £63.45k
Total expenditure £35.33k £55.20k £47.17k £17.13k £34.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PARK END
SIMONBURN
HEXHAM
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE48 3AA
Phone:
01434230202
Website:

No information available