LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TONBRIDGE COTTAGE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
relieve patients and former patients of the hospital and other invalids in the community who are sick convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirmed or in need of financial assistance and generally to help the charitable work of the said hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 23 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANDREW HESTER WELLS | Chair | 28 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Doreen Wadey | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea McDonnell | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Greer Jane Stolton | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Millman | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Greenhalgh | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PARKER | Trustee | 14 August 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £8.92k | £6.79k | £5.49k | £12.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.86k | £33.30k | £20.68k | £25.66k | £14.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1986. AND AS AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
INVICTA COMMUNITY CARE NHS TRUST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tonbridge Cottage Hospital
Vauxhall Lane
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN11 0NE
- Phone:
- 01732353653
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window