Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF ST ANNES ON THE SEA - BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 231290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required