CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 231929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity assists in the repair and maintenance of All Saints Church, Allesley, Coventry.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,303
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR M JONES Chair 10 March 2013
None on record
James Andrew Ots Trustee 24 June 2024
46TH COVENTRY (ALLESLEY PARK ) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ALLESLEY
Received: On time
Rev Sarah Elizabeth Ashelby Trustee 24 April 2024
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALLESLEY WELFARE CHARITY
Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN BARBER
Received: On time
Jennifer Seeley Trustee 12 June 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NOTTINGHAM SAINT PETER AND ALL SAINTS
Received: On time
Luke Clark Trustee 12 June 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ALLESLEY
Received: On time
Shera Venessa Payne Trustee 12 June 2023
None on record
MRS L M GROVE Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ALLESLEY
Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALLESLEY WELFARE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN BARBER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.21k £1.22k £1.28k £1.30k £1.30k
Total expenditure £1.18k £1.27k £1.25k £1.25k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
104 Birmingham Road
Allesley
Coventry
CV5 9GX
Phone:
02476402017
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available