Financial history THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA LIMITED

Charity number: 232391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.61m £11.77m £21.11m £21.52m £21.11m
Total expenditure £16.75m £12.24m £18.34m £21.13m £19.98m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.98m £1.98m £1.98m £2.00m
Income from government grants £4.20m £3.18m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.12m £7.11m £7.88m £6.24m £7.72m
Income - Other trading activities £653.00k £44.00k £450.00k £487.00k £426.00k
Income - Charitable activities £8.12m £3.63m £10.34m £12.14m £9.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £0 £1.00k £37.00k £55.00k
Income - Other £1.71m £980.00k £2.44m £2.62m £3.06m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.53m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.93m £11.20m £17.19m £19.68m £18.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.74m £1.04m £1.15m £1.45m £1.59m
Expenditure - Governance £58.00k £66.00k £61.00k £68.00k £68.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81.00k £0 £0 £0 £0