THE CATHOLIC LEAGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide fellowship among Catholics; the reunion of all Christians with the Apostolic See of Rome; the spread of the Catholic Faith; and deepening the Spititual Life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Woodruff | Chair |
|
||||||||||
CYRIL CHRISTOPHER WOOD FCA | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
THE REV CHRIS STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev Graeme Rowlands | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £720 | £603 | £509 | £480 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.83k | £0 | £5 | £2.06k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF FAITH AS CONTAINED IN LEAFLET RECEIVED 23 DECEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED 4 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 03 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF FELLOWSHIP AMONG CATHOLICS AND THE REUNION OF CHRISTENDOM. 2. CONVERSION TO THE CATHOLIC RELIGION. 3. DEEPENING THE SPIRITUAL LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MERINO GREEN
OAKRIDGE PARK
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 6FL
- Phone:
- 01908222232
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window