Financial history RHODES TRUST - PUBLIC PURPOSES FUND

Charity number: 232492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £92.46m £23.02m £16.43m £18.88m £27.44m
Total expenditure £28.84m £28.97m £37.87m £49.78m £55.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £96.66m £12.73m £9.94m £16.48m £21.28m
Income - Other trading activities £292.18k £0 £29.00k £481.01k £1.27m
Income - Charitable activities £6.35m £6.30m £10.16m £14.87m £19.58m
Income - Endowments £25.22m £11.26m £7.11m £15.32m £18.38m
Income - Investment £14.20m £15.25m £2.63m £2.37m £3.65m
Income - Other £184.17k £0 £784.00k £0 £30.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £101.15k £174.77k £0 £88.26k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.14m £25.47m £34.13m £44.34m £49.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.70m £3.50m £3.74m £5.44m £6.16m
Expenditure - Governance £62.92k £72.00k £57.00k £95.48k £103.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £60.72k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.25m £1.69m £1.89m £1.76m £1.65m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0