Financial history TOWN LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 232526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £47.50k £41.78k £46.99k £47.55k £48.48k
Total expenditure £31.56k £42.70k £52.10k £48.22k £50.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A