CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WADSWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of affordable housing for women aged 50 years and above living in the Bradshaw, Illingworth Moor, Illingworth and Holdsworth area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 02 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Richard Pickles | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||
HAZEL BEECHAM | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheridan Moore | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Ann Norrish | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.21k | £17.50k | £16.59k | £18.87k | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.55k | £12.38k | £13.72k | £16.96k | £15.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 02 MAY 1986 as amended on 19 Feb 2019 as amended on 10 Aug 2021 as amended on 09 Aug 2022 as amended on 10 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1. PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR 6 POOR WIDOWS OF ANY AGE OR SPINSTERS OF 50 YEARS OF AGE OR OVER WHO HAVE BEEN BORN OR RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND PAYMENTS FOR SAME EACH QUARTER DAY. 2. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BRADSHAW, HOLDSWORTH,ILLINGWORTH AND ILLINGWORTH MOOR
Linked charities
- 02 April 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Popples
HALIFAX
HX2 9QP
- Phone:
- 07402238801
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window