VISCOUNT PORTMAN'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 232695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity makes grants for (i) the upkeep of the Portman Family chapel at Bryanston (ii) support for the Friends of Blandford Hospital and (iii) support for the ecclesiastical and charitbale purposes of (a) Durwerston and Bryanston PCC (b) Blandford Forum PCC and (c) Blandford St Mary PCC

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,220
Total expenditure: £3,180

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Jane McCormick Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
LADY SARAH Diana Rowena Perceval GOOCH Trustee 29 September 2021
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Gerald Edward Richard Osborne Trustee 03 August 2021
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
David Pain Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Janet Jackson Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Gillian Mary Clarke Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Debrah Agnes McIsaac Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
The Rt Rev Dr Andrew Rumsey Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Stuart Frank Waite Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Nigel Peter Geoffrey Salisbury Trustee 31 December 2020
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY SALISBURY
Received: On time
Rosemary Karen Veronica Cook Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
The Ven Susan Anne Groom Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
The Rt Rev Karen Marisa Gorham Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
DEREK PARKER HOWSHALL Trustee 31 December 2020
EAST DORSET CHURCH PARTNERSHIP
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FERNDOWN
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Andrew Nicholas Perry Trustee 31 December 2020
MARTYRS MEMORIAL AND CHURCH OF ENGLAND TRUST
Recently registered
POOLE MISSIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Received: 133 days late
The Revd Canon DAVID BALDWIN Trustee 31 December 2020
THE FRED YOUNG TRUST
Received: On time
BEAMINSTER AND NETHERBURY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BEAMINSTER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Richard Ogilvie Merlot Chitty Trustee 31 December 2020
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Ven Penelope Sayer Trustee 31 December 2020
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Very Rev Nicholas Charles Papadopulos Trustee 31 December 2020
SARUM ST MICHAEL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE VEN ALAN PAUL JEANS Trustee
THE MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS DEPARTMENT CIO
Received: On time
ST BONIFACE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
SOWTER CLERICAL LIBRARY
Received: On time
WILTSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE VEN ANTONY CHARLES MACROW-WOOD Trustee
MILTON ABBEY HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
WOMEN OF NAZARETH (KNOWN AS THE LADIES OF THE GRAIL) CIO
Recently registered
GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF THE WOMEN OF NAZARETH (KNOWN AS THE LADIES OF THE GRAIL)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.10k £9.33k £9.60k £10.37k £11.22k
Total expenditure £5.43k £3.18k £3.18k £180 £3.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE AVENUE
WILTON
SP2 0FG
Phone:
01722411922
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available