FRIENDS OF THE MARY HEWETSON HOSPITAL, KESWICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide amenities for patients and staff of "The Mary Hewetson Hospital, Keswick".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shelagh Lambert | Chair | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Montgomery | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Jane Darigala | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr David John Brigham | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Anne Wilson | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eugene Patrick Lambert | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Gail Miller | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mary Smith | Trustee | 03 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER EDWIN HEMINGWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY ANNE SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.37k | £10.22k | £11.48k | £183.87k | £28.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £810 | £1.34k | £5.71k | £105.50k | £6.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEB 1993 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2015 as amended on 07 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AMENITIES FOR PATIENTS AND STAFF OF THE MARY HEWETSON HOSPITAL, KESWICK
Area of benefit
KESWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dr Eugene Lambert - Treasurer
HighGale
Applethwaite
Keswick
CUMBRIA
CA12 4PL
- Phone:
- 07801259482
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window